[20+] Magic math with Answers | Math Tricks that open your mind

magic math: From today onwards, solve all the maths questions in a pinch with the wonderful magic math. Just by looking at Maths Questions, all the questions will be solved with this Shortcut Maths Tricks also with magic math because all these Magical Short Tricks have the power to solve all your questions, so from now onwards remember all these Short Tricks and magic math very well and at the same time, You can also download great PDF of all these Maths Short Tricks and magic in math or magic math.

Complete Notes related to Complete magic math Tricks and pictures have been provided here below. In Maths Magical Short Tricks called magic math, we are also providing PDF of complete notes of Important Maths Formula Download for you, which you can easily see and download those PDFs if you have any problem in PDF. If it comes, you can tell us by commenting so that we can help you completely.

Are you looking for new and exciting ways to teach math to your kids? Do you want to make math interesting for your kids? You can always count on math tricks to help your child with maths.

Math tricks and magic math for kids are fun and engaging, and a great way to spark your child’s interest in math. There are lots of math tricks called magic in math that you can use to improve your child’s math skills. magic math Math tricks come in many forms like mind games, puzzles, calculator tricks, mental math tricks, and speed calculation tricks. They have also proven to be highly efficient, reliable, and fast when it comes to solving math problems. They are even more interesting than the traditional methods of solving maths.

In this article, we cover two types of magic math and magic in math

Top 10 Maths Tricks : magic math

#Tricks
1.Adding large numbers
2.Subtracting from 1,000
3.Multiplying 5 times any number
4.Division tricks
5.Multiplying by 9
6.10 and 11 times tricks
7.Percentage
8.Quickly square a two-digit number that ends in 5
9.Tough multiplication
10.Multiplying numbers that end in zero

1. Adding large numbers

If you add large numbers in your mind without any logic, then adding these big numbers can be difficult. But if these big numbers are solved by making them a multiple of 10, then it will be a very simple and quick addition process

544 + 338

550 – 544 = 6 and 340 – 338 = 2

Whose sum is 6 2 = 8.

To find the answer to the original equation, 8 must be subtracted from 890.

890 – 8 = 882

So the answer is 544 338 to 882.

2. Subtracting from 1,000

Here’s a basic rule for subtracting numbers greater than 1,000: Subtract every number except the last one by 9 and the last number by 10.

for example:

1,000 – 556

Step 1: Subtract 5 from 9 to get 4

Step 2: Subtract 5 from 9 to get 4

Step 3: Subtract 6 from 10 to get 4

The answer is 444.

3. Multiplying 5 times any number

A. Multiplying the number 5 by an even number is a quick way to find the answer.

For example, 5 x 4 =

Step 1: Cut the number which is being multiplied by 5 in half, this makes the number 4 the number 2.

Step 2: Add zero to the number to find the answer. In this case, the answer is 20.

Answer 5X4=20

B. The formula is slightly different when multiplying an odd number by 5.

For example, consider 5 x 3.

Step 1: Subtract one from the number to be multiplied by 5, in this example the number 3 becomes the number 2.

Step 2: Now halve the number 2, making it 1. Make 5 the last digit. The number produced is 15, which is the answer.

5 x 3 = 15

4. Division tricks

-10 if the number ends with 0

-9 when the digits are added together and the total is equally divisible by 9

-8 if the last three digits are equally divisible by 8 or 000

-6 If it is an even number and when the digits are added together then the answer is equally 3. is divisible by

-5 if it ends in 0 or 5

–4 if it ends in 00 or a two-digit number that is equally spaced as 4. is divisible by

–3 when the digits are added together and the resulting number is equally divisible by 3

5. Multiplying by 9

This is a simple method that is helpful in multiplying any number by 9.

Let’s use the example of 9 x 3.

Step 1: Subtract 1 from the number that is being multiplied by 9.

3 – 1 = 2

The number 2 is the first number in the answer to the equation.

Step 2: Subtract that number from the number 9.

9 – 2 = 7

The number 7 is the second number in the answer to the equation. Now write both the numbers together 27 The answer is

So, 9 x 3 = 27

Maths Magic – Simple mind Tricks  (fun Time)

This trick is for a person from 10 years to 99 years of age.

Step 1 – Tell your friend to think about your age in your mind.

Step 2 – Multiply the first digit of your age by 5. For example – If you are 23 years old then multiply the first digit of your age i.e. 2 by 5 = 2 x 5 = 10

Step 3 – After multiplying, whatever answer has come, then plus 4 in it. for example – 10 4 = 14

Step 4 – Now double this number. for example – 14 x 2 = 28

Step 5 – After double, the last digit of your age

TRICK 2 – MAGICAL 37

Step 1 – Ask your friend to write the same 3 digit number on a paper and ask him to keep it secret. For example such as 111, 222, 333, 444, 555, 666, 777, 888, 999

Step 2 – Now tell them to add those three digits and keep them secret. For example – If your friend has written 333 then 3 3 3 = 9

Step 3 – Now tell to divide the same 3 digits by their sum (keep it secret). for example – 333/9

Step 4 – Your answer will always be 37.

VEDIC MATH You Can Say This : Math Magic

Vedic mathematics is an easy way to solve difficult arithmetical calculations. It was discovered from the Vedas by Swami Bharati Krishna Tirthaji. Swamiji considered it as a gift given by ancient saints to the world. Swamiji rediscovered it from the Vedas between 1911 and 1918. In this mainly 16 word formulas have been given. You can also call them tricks. The mind works naturally with these sources and the question is answered immediately by the mind.

question is answered immediately by the mind.

With the help of Vedic mathematics, difficult calculations can be easily solved with the help of formulas, which is its greatest feature. Solving maths questions from Vedic maths is quite fun. With the help of this, the confidence and memory power of the children also increase. By practicing solving questions with the help of Vedic maths, you will also forget the use of a calculator for calculations. The special thing about Vedic Mathematics is that its formulas are applicable to all the chapters of all the branches of mathematics.

Now we will see some examples of Vedic Mathematics

Multiply any number by 9

2×9= 18
Subtract 1 from 2 then it comes 1 and subtract this 1 from 9 then it comes 8 and the answer is 18

63×99= 6237
Subtract 1 from 63 and it comes 62 and subtracts this 62 from 99 then it comes 37 and the answer is 6237

3) 454×999= 453546

Subtract 1 from 454 to get 453 and subtract 453 from 999 to get 546 and the answer is 453546

4) 546678×999999

Is it difficult to solve it, no, it can also be solved easily

Subtract 1 from 546678 to get 546677 and subtract this 546677 from 999999 to get 453322

So done answer = 546677453322

Now you are in This formula of Vedic Mathematics. It is called ekneunen purvena.

the easy trick of fast calculation

This article is related to the trick of fast calculation, just look at these

questions 64×66, 46×44, 12×18 Now when you sit to solve them, obviously you will multiply them and then find their answer. This will take you a lot of time. To save this time, we have brought another shortcut trick for you. This trick is of Vedic mathematics and very easy too. With the help of this trick, you will find the answer without multiplying it.

Que: 64×66=4224

TRICK OF FAST CALCULATION

[20+] Magic math with Answers | Math Tricks that open your mind

Solution: Multiply 6 by its next number 7 to get 42, 4, and 6 which is the unit digit of (64×66) multiplied among themselves 24= 4224

Easy trick of fast calculation

this article is related to the trick of fast calculation, just look at these questions 64×66, 46×44, 12×18 Now when you sit to solve them, obviously you will multiply them and then find their answer. This will take you a lot of time. To save this time, we have brought another shortcut trick for you. This trick is of Vedic mathematics and very easy too. With the help of this trick, you will find the answer without multiplying it.

Que: 64×66=4224

TRICK OF FAST CALCULATION

complex multiplication

Solution: 6 Let’s multiply its next number by 7 to get 42, 4, and 6 which is the unit digit of (64×66) multiplied together. 24= 4224

QUE: 46×44

TRICK OF FAST CALCULATION
[20+] Magic math with Answers | Math Tricks that open your mind

Solution: Multiply 4 by its next number 5 to get 20, 6, and 4 which is the unit digit of (46×44) multiplied among themselves 24= 2024

Note: This trick works when the sum of the last two digits of the number to be multiplied i.e. unit digits is 10 and its starting digits are the same (except unit digit) like (46×44) its starting digits are the same and its unit is The sum of digits is 10(6 4). By adding 1 to the initial digits, like adding 1 to 4, 5 and multiplying it by its initial digits and multiplying the unit digits together.

Now we will look at the three digit example

105×105=11025

Its starting digits are the same 10. Its next digit (number) is obtained by multiplying it by 11. 110 and the sum of its unit digits are (5 5=10). So multiply their unit digit to get 25. and thus 105×105=11025

Leave a Comment

This site uses Akismet to reduce spam. Learn how your comment data is processed.